Trustees PORLOCK VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 304614

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Mayhew | Chair | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzy Wolf | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Shorten | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Lamacraft | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Plumstead | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Cherry Woodley | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Hancock | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
RUTH HYETT | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
|||||
Anna Toeman | Trustee | 29 April 2012 |
|
|||||
Rosalinde Haw | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.