THE SPORTS FIELD

Charity Number: 304665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

VILLAGE AMENITY FOR SPORT / RECREATION

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £80,412
Total expenditure: £69,742

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 October 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WEDMORE PLAYING FIELDS MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian William Monson Chair 23 June 2015
None on record
Dominic Korbyn Edward Chick Trustee 03 February 2025
None on record
Raymond Newell Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record
Matthew Vaughan Lloyd Trustee 30 January 2023
None on record
Catherine Ann Hewish Trustee 15 November 2022
None on record
Michael Victor Gill Trustee 28 October 2019
None on record
Trevor Savage Trustee 28 October 2019
None on record
Jack Williams Trustee 28 October 2019
WEDMORE YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB
Received: 39 days late
SEVERN GROUP COMMITTEE OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS
Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days
David Harry Nicholls Trustee 28 October 2019
None on record
Richard Clive Banwell Trustee 15 July 2017
None on record
Philip George Patch Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £190.79k £78.05k £353.68k £198.38k £80.41k
Total expenditure £217.06k £52.74k £299.72k £280.70k £69.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £39.50k £12.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 04 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ashleigh House
Mudgley Road
WEDMORE
BS28 4DF
Phone:
07771852563
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available