Accounts and annual returns GRUNDISBURGH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304754
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2022 22 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 08 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 07 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required