Financial history HINDERCLAY VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 304900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £17.20k £13.39k £3.09k £44.84k £22.23k
Total expenditure £19.00k £13.39k £3.23k £46.22k £26.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.90k £1.01k N/A £38.59k £7.27k