Financial history HITCHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £17.61k £30.52k £37.14k £37.69k £35.05k
Total expenditure £16.00k £10.86k £26.08k £20.82k £35.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k £2.67k £5.00k N/A