Financial history LANGLEY BURRELL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £31.03k £23.08k £33.70k £24.23k £24.61k
Total expenditure £24.80k £11.43k £21.26k £17.02k £18.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £23.77k N/A £5.88k