Financial history 42ND BRIGHTON (SALTDEAN) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £19.07k £18.01k £13.35k £14.39k £13.84k
Total expenditure £7.57k £19.72k £13.79k £17.32k £10.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £17.91k N/A N/A N/A