Financial history CONCORD VIDEO AND FILM COUNCIL LIMITED

Charity number: 305990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £36.84k £53.89k £40.69k £39.98k £34.71k
Total expenditure £26.51k £35.63k £27.84k £35.22k £30.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.78k £1.55k N/A N/A