Financial history THE LORD'S TAVERNERS

Charity Number: 306054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £4.74m £4.05m £5.90m £6.10m £6.16m
Total expenditure £6.22m £4.37m £6.30m £7.57m £7.10m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k £130.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.55m £3.04m £3.44m £3.39m £3.69m
Income - Other trading activities £2.04m £885.43k £0 £0 £2.37m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £2.35m £2.59m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £152.00k £122.04k £110.97k £118.56k £105.24k
Income - Other £0 £0 £505 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £5.00k £45.97k £587.24k £27.00k £77.83k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.62m £2.43m £3.56m £4.29m £3.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.60m £1.94m £2.74m £3.28m £3.27m
Expenditure - Governance £269.00k £236.98k £348.95k £323.92k £237.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.11m £95.12k £0 £170.02k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £32.95k £26.26k £27.39k £22.43k £17.48k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0