YHA (ENGLAND AND WALES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
'TO HELP ALL, ESPECIALLY YOUNG PEOPLE OF LIMITED MEANS, TO A GREATER KNOWLEDGE, LOVE AND CARE OF THE COUNTRYSIDE, AND APPRECIATION OF THE CULTUAL VALUES OF TOWNS AND CITIES, PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING YOUTH HOSTELS OR OTHER ACCOMMODATION FOR THEM IN THEIR TRAVELS, AND THUS TO PROMOTE THEIR HEALTH, RECREATION AND EDUCATION.'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income:
£61,186,310
Donations and legacies | £796.47k | |
Charitable activities | £48.65m | |
Other trading activities | £6.06m | |
Investments | £162.88k | |
Other | £5.51m |
Total expenditure:
£64,223,730
Raising funds | £411.74k | |
Charitable activities | £63.81m | |
Other | £0 |
£16,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £546,620 from 1 government contract(s) and £383,841 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £411.74k | |
Charitable expenditure | £63.81m |
People

1164 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
1193 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 10 |
£70k to £80k | 4 |
£80k to £90k | 4 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 June 2007: Standard registration
- Y H A (Working name)
- YHA (ENGLAND AND WALES) LIMITED (Previous name)
- YOUTH HOSTEL TRUST OF ENGLAND AND WALES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Helen Hart | Chair | 09 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||
MX SARAH CLAIRE BREWIN | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
James Redfearn | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Rej Bhumbra | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Paula Newton | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
Clare Louise Parsons | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
Sarah Lusty | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Anna Louise Welsh | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Darren Richard Barker | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Caleb William Mark Stevens | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
CLARE ELIZABETH HELEN FORDHAM | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Andrew Varley | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
Simon Gareth Reeve | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
CATHRYN ALICE HAYHURST | Trustee | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Turnock | Trustee | 11 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.87m | £26.26m | £35.56m | £56.91m | £61.19m | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.16m | £40.63m | £44.90m | £59.48m | £64.22m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £546.62k | |
|
Income from government grants | £74.36k | £10.71m | £2.24m | N/A | £383.84k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.58m | £1.80m | £1.81m | £1.51m | £796.47k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £6.89m | £2.02m | £3.68m | £5.07m | £6.06m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £47.38m | £22.21m | £29.72m | £42.74m | £48.65m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £27.00k | £20.00k | £21.00k | £33.00k | £162.88k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £210.00k | £332.00k | £7.56m | £5.51m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £832.18k | £1.35m | £1.41m | £1.19m | £350.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £56.77m | £40.32m | £44.49m | £59.13m | £63.81m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £384.00k | £301.00k | £405.00k | £353.00k | £411.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £149.00k | £144.00k | £148.00k | £178.23k | £268.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £99.49m | £95.14m | £85.41m | £82.43m | £71.82m | |
|
Long-term investments | £960.00k | £1.04m | £1.08m | £1.02m | £1.04m | |
|
Other assets | £5.27m | £6.38m | £14.39m | £14.36m | £12.53m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£7.15m | -£7.27m | -£3.51m | -£3.30m | -£3.82m | |
|
Total liabilities | £57.42m | £69.13m | £77.55m | £77.69m | £69.27m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/12/1933 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/02/1967 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/09/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/09/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/09/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 JUN 2018 as amended on 13 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
A) TO HELP ALL, ESPECIALLY YOUNG PEOPLE OF LIMITED MEANS, TO A GREATER KNOWLEDGE, LOVE AND CARE OF THE COUNTRYSIDE, AND APPRECIATION OF THE CULTURAL VALUES OF TOWNS AND CITIES, PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING YOUTH HOSTELS OR OTHER ACCOMMODATION FOR THEM IN THEIR TRAVELS, AND THUS TO PROMOTE THEIR HEALTH, RECREATION AND EDUCATION; B) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 22 June 2007 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
YHA (England and Wales)
Trevelyan House
MATLOCK
DE4 3YH
- Phone:
- 01629592751
- Email:
- customerservices@yha.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window