Trustees PORT REGIS SCHOOL LTD
Charity Number: 306218

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Arthur Hussey | Chair | 05 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christa Jane Band | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Snow | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Cotton | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Guy Thomas | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Frances Hattersley | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Timothy Herbert Jones | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE JACQUELINE O'KEEFE | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Balfour Henshilwood | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Timothy Deiniol Walker-Jones | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Giles Richard Collingridge Morant | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Boswell | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
FIONA ELISABETH LOVERIDGE | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gavin White | Trustee | 28 November 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.