Financial history CANFORD SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 306315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £19.84m £26.59m £23.32m £24.91m £27.45m
Total expenditure £19.81m £19.72m £21.19m £22.90m £25.28m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £844.59k £494.02k £2.60k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £99.94k £152.76k £196.36k £399.21k £502.99k
Income - Other trading activities £784.05k £644.83k £1.28m £1.38m £1.57m
Income - Charitable activities £17.93m £19.35m £21.60m £22.78m £24.88m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £175.76k £180.40k £239.96k £354.54k £481.22k
Income - Other £852.68k £6.26m £10.28k £0 £14.52k
Income - Legacies £0 £1.00k £1.00k £100.00k £50.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £19.02m £19.12m £19.91m £21.44m £23.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds £789.77k £591.52k £1.28m £1.46m £1.45m
Expenditure - Governance £17.79k £64.86k £68.49k £69.66k £80.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £80.31k £0 £0 £41.81k £43.16k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0