Accounts and annual returns ROSELYON SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity Number: 306583
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 29 February 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 July 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 26 July 2018 26 days late