Trustees RINGWOOD UNITED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 307094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Stephen David Miles Trustee 25 October 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, RINGWOOD
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, ST LEONARDS AND ST IVES
Received: On time
Mary DeBoos Trustee 16 July 2024
None on record
Jacqueline Clare Brown B A Hons Trustee 12 December 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, RINGWOOD
Received: On time
EDNA ROSE THOMAS LEGACY FOR ST JOHN'S CHURCH, POULNER
Received: On time
David Victor Brown Trustee 15 July 2014
None on record
Kevin Paul Jones B A MCIAT Trustee 12 December 2011
None on record
MR J D HERON Trustee
POULNER INFANT SCHOOL NURSERY TRUST
Received: On time
MR W S RIPPON-SWAINE Trustee
None on record