Financial history BALLARD SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 307328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.36m £6.74m £7.12m £7.59m £7.99m
Total expenditure £5.62m £5.90m £6.41m £7.29m £7.59m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £186.90k £50.65k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £325.11k £1.00k £0 £6.53k
Income - Other trading activities £18.30k £0 £23.19k £40.53k £61.48k
Income - Charitable activities £5.05m £6.20m £6.99m £7.35m £7.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £100.78k £80.86k £81.78k £145.85k £232.59k
Income - Other £195.32k £141.17k £21.87k £53.10k £11.78k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.61m £5.89m £6.40m £7.27m £7.56m
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.23k £12.75k £13.27k £15.85k £22.70k
Expenditure - Governance £11.02k £11.22k £14.03k £19.86k £17.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £12.75k £13.27k £15.85k £22.70k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0