Financial history WALHAMPTON SCHOOL TRUST LTD.

Charity number: 307330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.28m £5.45m £5.83m £6.06m £6.56m
Total expenditure £5.36m £5.37m £5.80m £6.00m £6.30m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £165.71k N/A £83.89k £120.84k
Income - Donations and legacies £26.41k £20.86k £18.14k £1.12k £16.52k
Income - Other trading activities £40.12k £40.25k £75.90k £98.16k £114.83k
Income - Charitable activities £5.47m £5.21m £5.72m £5.93m £6.39m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £181.22k £21.18k £27.21k £42.53k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.27m £5.28m £5.66m £5.87m £6.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £84.05k £84.81k £129.25k £99.70k £106.39k
Expenditure - Governance £46.79k £0 £0 £0 £65.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £4.03k £6.60k £16.60k £23.32k £28.90k