Financial history NORTHAMPTONSHIRE DOMESTIC ABUSE SERVICE

Charity number: 1070741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £562.37k £1.28m £1.04m £1.24m £1.40m
Total expenditure £683.08k £993.34k £1.13m £1.25m £1.47m
Income from government contracts £170.00k £490.35k £570.80k £656.14k £885.93k
Income from government grants £16.58k £119.61k £18.55k £22.28k £4.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £55.83k £80.31k £53.12k £82.98k £56.47k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £135
Income - Charitable activities £488.48k £0 £982.73k £1.14m £1.31m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.98k £1.68k £1.72k £8.35k £18.91k
Income - Other £14.08k £168.49k £3.22k £8.51k £11.74k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £683.08k £993.34k £1.13m £1.25m £1.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.30k £4.49k £8.08k £6.45k £6.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0