Governing document NORTHAMPTONSHIRE DOMESTIC ABUSE SERVICE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 OCT 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 MAY 2017 as amended on 14 Dec 2022 as amended on 12 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS AFFECTED BY DOMESTIC ABUSE THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN ABUSED BY PERSON(S) WITH WHOM THEY ARE OR HAVE BEEN LIVING. SERVICES WILL INCLUDE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION, SUPPORT TO THE WHOLE FAMILY INCLUDING THE CHILDREN AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS SHALL FURTHER THE SAID OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.