Trustees NORTHAMPTONSHIRE DOMESTIC ABUSE SERVICE

Charity number: 1070741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GLYNIS BLISS Chair 19 June 2015
None on record
Jaime O'Beirne Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
Shahnaz Zaman Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
Felicity Lister Trustee 31 January 2024
None on record
Andrea Gomm Trustee 14 June 2023
None on record
Mark Behan Trustee 04 May 2022
QUINTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Rufia Ashraf Trustee 02 September 2020
NORTHAMPTON TOWN OF SANCTUARY
Received: On time
Joanna Burns Trustee 11 May 2020
None on record
BEVERLEY McConnell Trustee 01 June 2014
None on record