Accounts and annual returns PAGE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 307660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 23 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 27 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required