Financial history DOVER COLLEGE

Charity number: 307856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.45m £5.21m £5.32m £6.18m £6.88m
Total expenditure £5.36m £4.79m £5.09m £6.48m £6.95m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500.96k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £175.67k £186.11k £11.57k £90.75k £443.78k
Income - Other trading activities £5.18k £6.40k £14.52k £285.64k £265.54k
Income - Charitable activities £4.74m £4.43m £4.96m £5.74m £6.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.70k £530 £2.61k £22.75k £55.37k
Income - Other £531.35k £586.03k £333.53k £37.45k £22.27k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.13m £4.69m £4.98m £6.34m £6.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £220.61k £82.98k £101.43k £141.29k £248.90k
Expenditure - Governance £31.15k £33.98k £28.14k £15.00k £15.78k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.48k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £6.54k £11.07k £17.17k £0 £0