Financial history ST KITTS AND NEVIS FRIENDLY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1062488
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.77k £8.29k £8.33k £10.38k £14.11k
Total expenditure £19.82k £8.88k £6.46k £11.19k £13.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £700 N/A N/A N/A N/A