Financial history NIGHTINGALE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1061850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.58k £9.37k £42.34k £92.32k £27.05k
Total expenditure £8.59k £9.14k £22.22k £71.81k £40.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A