Financial history LAMBROOK SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 309098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £10.39m £11.40m £13.39m £15.31m £16.54m
Total expenditure £9.47m £9.70m £11.09m £13.21m £14.47m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £447.12k £518.30k £391.13k £442.35k £376.17k
Income - Other trading activities £55.81k £33.19k £81.03k £44.41k £50.27k
Income - Charitable activities £9.79m £10.85m £12.90m £14.65m £15.80m
Income - Endowments £0 £518.30k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £89.95k £1.81k £13.14k £181.62k £320.64k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.37m £9.67m £11.09m £13.19m £14.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £98.02k £38.04k £0 £17.28k £63.84k
Expenditure - Governance £31.59k £51.42k £61.11k £68.28k £38.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0