EAST BERKSHIRE POST GRADUATE MEDICAL EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes financial grants to promote the furtherance of postgraduate education for members of the medical, dental and nursing profession in East Berkshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Buckinghamshire
- Surrey
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 15 November 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN MORRISON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Sandhya Tyagi | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ram Moorthy | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ANDREW SLATTERY | Trustee | 22 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER JOHN SEBIRE | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.32k | £2.82k | £3.00k | £7.22k | £4.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.99k | £2.97k | £2.28k | £4.08k | £13.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 JUNE 1964 AND SCHEME OF 18 MAY 1988 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 OCT 2020 as amended on 21 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS IN THE AREA SERVED BY THE EAST BERKSHIRE CLINICAL COMMISSIONING GROUP, BY WAY OF PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO PROMOTE THE FURTHERANCE OF POSTGRADUATE EDUCATION FOR HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS
Area of benefit
AREA SERVED BY EAST BERKSHIRE DISTRICT MEDICAL AUTHORITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
John Lister Education Centre
Wexham Park Hospital
Wexham Street
Wexham
Slough
SL2 4HL
- Phone:
- 01753634377
- Email:
- maura.stock@nhs.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window