Financial history SWINBROOK AND WIDFORD EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity Number: 309592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.11k £1.46k £6.43k £4.73k £22.51k
Total expenditure £165 £0 £0 £0 £12.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A