PREP SCHOOLS TRUST

Charity number: 309639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset
  • East Sussex
  • Gloucestershire
  • Northumberland
  • Oxfordshire
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 October 1969: Standard registration
  • 23 May 2018: Funds received from 312085 BARFIELD SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ASHDOWN HOUSE (Working name)
  • CHANDLINGS (Working name)
  • KITEBROOK HOUSE (Working name)
  • MOWDEN HALL (Working name)
  • OLD MALTHOUSE (Working name)
  • COTHILL EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
  • COTHILL HOUSE SCHOOL LIMITED (Previous name)
  • COTHILL TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Elizabeth Ann McKendrick Chair 01 September 2022
THE EMMOTT FOUNDATION LIMITED
Received: On time
SARUM HALL SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
THE WELLINGTON COLLEGE
Received: On time
ELSTREE SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
James Barnes Trustee 02 January 2025
None on record
Colin Hargreaves Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Mark Beard Trustee 01 February 2024
THE OXFORD PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
Jason Houlden-Stanley Trustee 01 February 2024
None on record
Henrietta Lindsell Trustee 01 January 2024
BEESTON HALL SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Canon Francis William Miles Burkitt Trustee 01 September 2023
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF THE HOLY AND UNDIVIDED TRINITY OF ELY
Received: On time
THE ELY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Alison Jane Derham Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Lucinda Mary Elisabeth Newcombe Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Julian Peter Spencer Trustee 01 March 2020
TRINITY WINCHESTER
Received: On time
WILLIAM HUGH PITMAN Trustee 23 September 2019
None on record
Toby James Gibson Trustee 26 June 2019
None on record
Jacqualyn Christina Pain Trustee 25 June 2019
None on record
Countess Peta Martine Darnley Trustee 09 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £21.44m £19.50m £19.01m £20.50m £21.24m
Total expenditure £22.95m £21.56m £18.23m £19.18m £21.21m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.18m £174.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £222.00k £1.43m £1.70m £968.00k £590.00k
Income - Other trading activities £493.00k £211.00k £158.00k £251.00k £351.00k
Income - Charitable activities £19.62m £17.85m £17.05m £19.28m £19.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £1.11m £12.00k £101.00k £0 £814.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £22.81m £21.41m £17.49m £19.08m £21.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £111.00k £152.00k £182.00k £66.00k £71.00k
Expenditure - Governance £69.00k £56.00k £52.00k £55.00k £61.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £25.00k £0 £564.00k £32.00k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £41.46m £41.12m £34.09m £35.67m £40.85m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.40m £1.67m £8.58m £4.90m £3.70m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £7.48m £9.45m £8.57m £5.15m £9.10m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 July 2020 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 July 2020 27 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 Cothill
ABINGDON
OX13 6JN
Phone:
01865390720