Financial history SHIPLAKE COURT LIMITED

Charity Number: 309651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £10.85m £11.76m £13.68m £15.52m £16.54m
Total expenditure £10.00m £10.81m £11.87m £12.93m £14.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £268.36k £117.33k N/A £12.08k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £272.40k £8.47k £55.60k £24.63k £111.18k
Income - Other trading activities £150.14k £160.48k £227.40k £1.65m £0
Income - Charitable activities £10.40m £11.47m £13.39m £13.72m £15.93m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23.92k £1.77k £1.26k £125.73k £335.99k
Income - Other £0 £8.63k £2.69k £0 £160.08k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.88m £10.67m £11.76m £12.76m £13.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £37.03k £137.68k £116.01k £54.12k £75.87k
Expenditure - Governance £20.41k £15.31k £17.10k £18.77k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £85.65k £0 £0 £116.79k £0