Financial history DRAGON SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 309676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £17.69m £17.89m £20.94m £21.53m £25.04m
Total expenditure £16.54m £17.52m £19.34m £20.43m £22.93m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £19.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £224.00k £69.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £469.00k £635.00k £2.05m £539.00k £1.47m
Income - Other trading activities £13.00k £21.00k £109.00k £54.00k £185.00k
Income - Charitable activities £16.94m £17.15m £18.74m £20.15m £22.52m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £55.00k £12.00k £41.00k £785.00k £860.00k
Income - Other £210.00k £69.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £178.62k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.23m £17.22m £18.98m £20.02m £22.43m
Expenditure - Raising funds £309.00k £305.00k £369.00k £406.00k £492.00k
Expenditure - Governance £34.00k £27.00k £117.00k £88.00k £100.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0