Financial history ST EDWARD'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 309681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £24.95m £25.70m £29.68m £32.54m £37.96m
Total expenditure £23.23m £26.11m £28.81m £32.86m £36.08m
Income from government contracts £88.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.15m £519.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £347.00k £305.00k £632.00k £173.00k £1.10m
Income - Other trading activities £557.00k £128.00k £916.00k £1.16m £1.53m
Income - Charitable activities £22.64m £24.53m £27.97m £31.00m £34.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £248.00k £208.00k £160.00k £212.00k £548.00k
Income - Other £1.15m £525.00k £0 £0 £520.00k
Income - Legacies £277.00k £205.00k £416.00k £42.00k £147.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £22.57m £25.97m £28.68m £32.67m £34.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £201.00k £149.00k £130.00k £192.00k £237.00k
Expenditure - Governance £24.00k £30.00k £29.00k £28.00k £59.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £21.00k £49.00k £37.00k £36.00k £28.50k
Expenditure - Other £453.00k £0 £0 £0 £1.14m