Financial history RIPON COLLEGE CUDDESDON

Charity number: 309714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.78m £1.99m £1.88m £1.94m £2.06m
Total expenditure £1.71m £1.75m £1.98m £2.08m £2.00m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £78.01k £54.14k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £117.54k £90.95k £52.68k £78.11k £105.14k
Income - Other trading activities £33.14k £23.92k £108.63k £148.70k £186.50k
Income - Charitable activities £1.60m £1.85m £1.70m £1.68m £1.70m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £26.57k £23.29k £23.24k £32.83k £62.83k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £7.00k £4.38k £13.65k £29.86k £75.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.64m £1.68m £1.89m £1.99m £1.89m
Expenditure - Raising funds £70.32k £73.02k £87.73k £91.14k £115.03k
Expenditure - Governance £9.95k £9.95k £8.94k £9.75k £10.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0