Accounts and annual returns OXFORD CENTRE FOR HEBREW AND JEWISH STUDIES

Charity Number: 309720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 14 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 14 February 2025 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2023 24 June 2024 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 24 June 2024 24 days late
Annual return 31 July 2022 03 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 03 April 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2021 26 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 26 March 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 08 March 2021 On Time