PARSON LATHAM EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THIS CHARITY OPERATES WITHIN THE PARISH OF OUNDLE AND MAKES ANNUAL GRANTS TO YOUNG PEOPLE FOR FURTHER EDUCATION OR APPRENTSHIPS AND VOCATIONAL COURSES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northamptonshire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.59k | £9.51k | £11.87k | £10.11k | £3.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.05k | £5.97k | £11.21k | £10.11k | £4.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 129 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 129 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 2ND MAY 1924 AS AMENDED 21ST APRIL 2009 AND ORDER MADE UNDER SEX DISCRIMINATION ACT 1975 ON 22ND JULY 1982
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF SPECIAL FACILITIES FOR THE INSTRUCTION OF CHILDREN IN PRACTICAL AND TECHNICAL SUBJECTS. PROVISION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL, TECHNICAL, TEACHER TRAINING, OR UNIVERSITY EXHIBITIONS, OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES FOR BOYS AND GIRLS RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA, SUBJECT TO CERTAIN SPECIFIED CONDITIONS.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF OUNDLE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window