Financial history WALES QUALITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 1062140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £251.09k £312.01k £412.39k £297.88k £225.61k
Total expenditure £239.40k £265.55k £288.93k £323.36k £249.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.27k £22.43k £1.57k N/A N/A