Financial history THE HAILEYBURY SOCIETY

Charity number: 310014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £141.41k £67.18k £148.88k £93.00k £88.47k
Total expenditure £195.97k £162.33k £242.04k £180.60k £180.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A