KILMERSDON SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintain school foundation trust fund. Make payments to the school as required and approved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- 29 October 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penelope Anne Hutton | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|||
Stephen Roy Bamford | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|||
Brian Nagle | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||
MRS ROSIE KANE | Trustee |
|
||||
DAVID JOHN HIRST | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £786 | £801 | £817 | £834 | £856 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 185 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 185 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 5TH APRIL 1939
Charitable objects
1. THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE SCHOOL PREMISES OF THE FOUNDATION. 2(A) ASSISTING PUPILS TO ATTEND SCHOOLS, INSTITUTIONS, OR CLASSES FOR PURPOSES OF EDUCATION OTHER THAN ELEMENTARY; (B) MAKING ARRANGEMENTS APPROVED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR ATTENDING TO THE HEALTH OR PHYSICAL CONDITION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING ANY PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA; (C) OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS OF THE POORER CLASSES IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF KILMERSDON.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF KILMERSDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTWARDS
STRATTON ROAD
HOLCOMBE
RADSTOCK
BA3 5ED
- Phone:
- 01761232506
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window