THE CARTMEL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To preserve for the benefit of the inhabitants of Cartmel in the County of Cumbria the historical and architectural heritage of the Village of Cartmel and the natural beauty of its environment. 2. The provision of recreational facilities with the object of improving the lives of the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 02 July 1997: Standard registration
- THE CARTMEL VILLLAGE TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL RAWSTHORN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rachel Taylor | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Crabtree | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Anderson | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Knight | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ANDERSON | Trustee | 22 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £440 | £4.80k | £611 | £3.15k | £10.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.84k | £7.86k | £1.11k | £1.08k | £4.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
(1) TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CARTMEL IN THE COUNTY OF CUMBRIA THE HISTORICAL AND ARCHITECTURAL HERITAGE OF THE VILLAGE OF CARTMEL AND THE NATURAL BEAUTY OF ITS ENVIRONMENT AND (2) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
CARTMEL IN THE COUNTY OF CUMBRIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Horse Heads
Beckside
Cartmel
GRANGE-OVER-SANDS
Cumbria
LA11 7SW
- Phone:
- 01539536566
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window