Financial history MUSLIM EDUCATION ASSOCIATION-ROCHDALE

Charity Number: 1064239
Charity reporting is up to date (49 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £419.07k £551.04k £632.12k £746.80k £797.44k
Total expenditure £455.45k £563.30k £651.17k £612.19k £822.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £434.76k £632.12k £746.80k £797.43k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £116.28k £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £563.30k £99.17k £69.13k £93.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £552.01k £543.07k £728.97k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £95.01k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0