Accounts and annual returns KOCO COMMUNITY RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity number: 1080577
Charity is in administration
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024
Annual return 31 March 2023
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

Annual return 31 March 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window