Financial history THE HAVEN WOLVERHAMPTON

Charity number: 1065427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.13m £2.52m £2.79m £3.45m £3.13m
Total expenditure £2.08m £2.43m £2.80m £3.12m £3.78m
Income from government contracts £851.94k £800.29k £717.94k £1.59m £977.09k
Income from government grants N/A £312.07k £1.14m N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £197.17k £240.01k £352.22k £406.33k £385.04k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.88m £2.24m £2.41m £3.01m £2.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.50k £899 £293 £4.09k £14.20k
Income - Other £49.07k £31.61k £27.77k £35.30k £48.15k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £5.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.93m £2.28m £2.62m £2.96m £3.57m
Expenditure - Raising funds £152.55k £157.13k £173.10k £159.55k £217.56k
Expenditure - Governance £27.97k £22.11k £15.37k £1.82k £2.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0