PRESTON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PRINCIPAL ACTIVITIES ARE PROVIDING WOMEN WHO ARE EXPERIENCING OR HAVE EXPERIENCED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE / SEXUAL VIOLENCE WITH A RANGE OF QUALITY SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR CHILDREN. THIS WILL ENABLE THEM TO MAKE INFORMED DECISIONS ABOUT THEIR FUTURE. SUPPORT IS ALSO PROVIDED TO MALE VICTIMS. THE ORGANISATION ALSO CAMPAIGNS AND RAISES AWARENESS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE / SEXUAL VIOLENCE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,390 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 19 April 1997: Standard registration
- 09 August 2022: Funds received from 1164240 LESLEY KELLY FOUNDATION
- P W R (Working name)
- PRESTON WOMEN'S REFUGE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE WILLIAMS | Chair | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janice Hurst | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Clubb | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Haslam | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.73k | £111.30k | £113.89k | £112.23k | £146.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.81k | £86.77k | £101.74k | £113.44k | £121.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.50k | £15.95k | £6.71k | N/A | £15.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/12/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE SAFETY OF INDIVIDUALS (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WOMEN) WHO ARE EXPERIENCING OR HAVE EXPERIENCED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE OR SEXUAL VIOLENCE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: I)PROVIDING TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION TO SUCH WOMEN AND THEIR CHILDREN WHERE REQUIRED; II)PROVIDING A RANGE OF OTHER CHARITABLE SERVICES TO SUCH WOMEN AND THEIR CHILDREN WHERE REQUIRED; III)PROVIDING SUPPORT TO SUCH WOMEN WHO ARE EXPERIENCING OR HAVE EXPERIENCED ABUSE AND OR VIOLENCE IN THEIR PERSONAL OR FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS. IV) PROVIDING SUPPORT TO MALE VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING SOME CHARITABLE SERVICES TO SUPPORT SUCH MEN, WHEREVER IT IS FEASIBLE AND DOES NOT COMPROMISE THE SUPPORT THE COMPANY GIVES TO FEMALE VICTIMS. V) PROVIDING SUPPORT TO WOMEN MEN AND CHILDREN WHO HAVE BEEN VICTIMS OF SEXUAL VIOLENCE BY PROVIDING A RANGE OF CHARITABLE SERVICES INCLUDING ADVICE AND ADVOCACY SUPPORT, TO ASSIST THEM TO OVERCOME THE EFFECTS OF THE SEXUAL VIOLENCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harbour House
Portway
Preston
PR2 2DW
- Phone:
- 01772201301
- Email:
- enquries@pdvs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window