Financial history BURY UNITARIAN CHURCH

Charity number: 1078570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £73.24k £77.18k £89.47k £90.61k £106.77k
Total expenditure £72.86k £63.59k £71.67k £45.97k £96.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A