VOLUNTARY ACTION STRATFORD ON AVON DISTRICT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's object and principle activity is to promote any charitable purposes for the benefit of the community in the Stratford-on-Avon District; in particular, the advancement of education, the protection of health and the relief of poverty, distress and sickness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £74,601 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
197 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 21 January 1998: Standard registration
- THE COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE AND VOLUNTEER BUREAUX STRATFORD ON AVON DISTRICT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Roache | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Ian Prosser | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kazimierz Aukstolis | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Wells | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Goody | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Russel | Trustee | 10 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £246.93k | £279.65k | £229.71k | £304.02k | £327.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.82k | £248.75k | £244.64k | £304.30k | £337.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £45.04k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £66.79k | £116.12k | £46.40k | £45.04k | £74.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 March 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 March 2024 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 DECEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF NAME CHANGE OF INCORPORATION ON 20 APRIL 2009.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY , DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID PURPOSES, BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE, TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE SAME AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER THE COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
STRATFORD ON AVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Arden Court
Arden Street
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Warwickshire
CV37 6NT
- Phone:
- 01789262889
- Email:
- hello@vasa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window