Financial history NIAB

Charity number: 1064230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £26.89m £31.14m £41.84m £29.71m £32.90m
Total expenditure £23.35m £27.50m £31.57m £32.38m £32.41m
Income from government contracts £2.16m N/A N/A £3.54m £3.20m
Income from government grants £5.91m £6.02m £13.38m £6.49m £6.64m
Income - Donations and legacies £828.00k £500.00k £1.16m £947.00k £683.00k
Income - Other trading activities £7.12m £7.83m £7.51m £7.70m £0
Income - Charitable activities £18.87m £22.75m £33.12m £21.00m £32.11m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £75.00k £62.00k £56.00k £63.00k £105.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £15.62m £27.50m £21.23m £22.44m £32.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.73m £0 £10.34m £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £422.00k £246.00k £148.00k £150.00k £172.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £9.94m £0