LADY NORTHAMPTON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 310549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity provides limited financial assistance for students resident within the Parish of Moulsoe and about to start college/university/similar.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £43
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Milton Keynes

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 October 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Nicholas Anthony Paul Evans Chair 27 January 2016
JANE GOODMAN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
QUEEN ANN AND JOHN REVIS ALMSHOUSES
Received: 1 day late
SARAH HOSKINS Trustee
None on record
NIGEL GEORGE WILLIAM RICHARDS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11 £11 £29 £9 £43
Total expenditure £450 £116 £0 £100 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 August 2024 289 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Drakes Gorse
Cranfield Road
Moulsoe
NEWPORT PAGNELL
Buckinghamshire
MK16 0HB
Phone:
07973 952164
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available