Financial history BERKHAMSTED SCHOOLS GROUP

Charity number: 310630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £34.32m £37.11m £39.24m £41.79m £48.41m
Total expenditure £33.35m £34.28m £37.31m £39.76m £44.24m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £160.00k £223.00k £182.00k £105.00k £118.00k
Income - Other trading activities £930.00k £1.07m £1.12m £1.40m £1.61m
Income - Charitable activities £31.98m £35.37m £37.85m £39.82m £45.63m
Income - Endowments £43.00k £223.00k £182.00k £66.00k £57.00k
Income - Investment £111.00k £55.00k £82.00k £92.00k £88.00k
Income - Other £1.14m £389.00k £4.00k £371.00k £958.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £30.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £32.35m £33.35m £36.30m £38.62m £42.92m
Expenditure - Raising funds £26.00k £20.00k £21.00k £22.00k £17.00k
Expenditure - Governance £170.00k £194.00k £158.00k £160.00k £160.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £19.21k £21.00k £22.00k £17.00k
Expenditure - Other £976.00k £911.00k £980.00k £1.12m £1.31m