THE ROYAL CALEDONIAN EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In support of the education and wellbeing of the offspring of current and former Scottish Armed Forces personnel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £28,902 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 March 1963: Standard registration
- 14 June 1995: Removed
- Forces Children Scotland (Working name)
- ROYAL CALEDONIAN EDUCATION TRUST (Working name)
- ROYAL CALEDONIAN ASYLUM (Previous name)
- ROYAL CALEDONIAN SCHOOLS TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harvey Tilley | Chair | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Jackson | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Bryce | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Barbour-Smith | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Rae | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dickie | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Max Ogilvy Young | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Isla Campbell Lupton | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £342.62k | £512.35k | £489.25k | £406.75k | £219.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £584.25k | £602.57k | £696.02k | £832.63k | £727.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.71k | £50.36k | £20.00k | £28.90k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £351.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £109.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £51.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £449.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £153.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £87.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £23.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ACT OF INCORPORATION DATED 14TH JUNE 1815
Charitable objects
EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF SOLDIERS, SAILORS AND MARINES, NATIVES OF SCOTLAND, AND OF INDIGENT SCOTCH PARENTS RESIDENT IN LONDON, NOT ENTITLED TO PAROCHIAL RELIEF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 26 March 1963 : Standard registration
- 14 June 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Melting Pot
15 Calton Road
EDINBURGH
EH8 8DL
- Phone:
- 0131 322 7350
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window