Financial history HENRY COLBORN (OR COLBRON)

Charity Number: 310961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £87.48k £55.22k £100.59k £98.92k £98.10k
Total expenditure £89.49k £26.60k £131.77k £88.73k £117.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A