Financial history Town Close Educational Trust Ltd

Charity number: 311293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £5.57m £5.67m £5.75m £6.30m £6.46m
Total expenditure £5.02m £4.99m £5.61m £6.21m £6.88m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £46.77k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £300.88k £0 £0 £198.79k £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.75k £5.53m £5.60m £0 £6.21m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £5.26m £142.40k £144.15k £6.10m £246.32k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.02m £4.99m £5.61m £6.21m £6.88m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £78.28k £87.80k £109.48k £116.76k £186.54k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0