Financial history THE WILLIAM PURNELL EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity number: 311487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £155 £329 £493 £511 £179
Total expenditure £210 £0 £150 £0 £200
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A